Maupin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marjorie Maupin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00722
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER AFFIRMING the Final Decision of the Commissioner signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/27/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME 22 . Defendant may file her opposition to Plaintiff's opening brief by no later than July 21, 2017. Plaintiff may file her optional reply brief by no later than August 7, 2017. The Court CAUTIONS the parties that it will not entertain any further requests for extensions in this matter. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/13/2017. (Timken, A)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME 19 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/24/2017. The deadline for Plaintiff to file her opening brief is extended to May 22, 2017. The Court further ORDERS that the remaining deadlines in this matter shall be modified to accord with the extension provided in this Order. (Thorp, J)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Extension. Plaintiff may file her opening brief by no later than May 19, 2017. The Court further ORDERS that the remaining dates in the Scheduling Order for this case, (Doc. 6), are modified to accord with this extension. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/20/2017. (Timken, A)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted a second extension of time, up to and including February 13, 2017, to file her Confidential Letter Brief. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 6) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/22/2017. (Timken, A)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/25/16. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maupin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Maupin
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?