Phillips v. Randy's Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Phillips
Defendant: Randy's Trucking, Inc., Randy Gene Griffith and Kyle Griffith
Case Number: 1:2016cv00753
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 26, 2016. (Doc. 12). (Munoz, I)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/1/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 12/16/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 9/2/2016; Non-Expert 3/10/2017; Expert 5/8/2017. Class Certification Deadlines: Filed by 1/20/2017; Opposition by 2/24/2017; Reply by 3/3/2017; Hearing set for 4/7/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/19/2017; Hearing by 6/16/2 017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/30/2017; Hearing by 8/22/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Randy's Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Phillips
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy's Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Gene Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?