Young v. Sun Life and Health Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vicki Young
Defendant: Sun Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00822
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER closing the action signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER AFTER 52 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 3/30/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER extending time within which to submit a proposed judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/6/2018. (Filing Deadline: 2/21/2018).(Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW; ORDER DENYING 40 Request to Consider Extrinsic Evidence signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Stipulation to Continue Trial Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. Opening trial briefs due by 9/19/2017; responding trial briefs due by 10/17/2017. (Hall, S)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 29 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order Regarding Trial Briefs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2017. Responding briefs due by 9/5/2017. (Hall, S)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2017. (Hall, S)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 23 Request to Amend the Case Schedule Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/2017. (Hall, S)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/28/2016. Consent/Decline Deadline 12/9/2016. Discovery Deadline 4/14/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/21/2017; Hearing by 5/19/2017. Merits Briefs: Filed by 8/1/2017; Responsive Briefs due by 8/29/2017. Bench Trial/Oral Argument on Merits Briefs set for 9/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER SETTING Further Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/12/2016. Further Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Sun Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Young
Represented By: Glenn Robert Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Martin E. Rosen
Represented By: Adam Brooke Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?