Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Frank Valdez Lopez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00842
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/14/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER VACATING the 9/28/2017 hearing, to be reset by the Court at a later date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Defendant an additional 30 days to file its cross motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. The new deadline for Defendant to file its motion is July 19, 2017. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. No further extension of this date will be granted. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/12/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2017. It is ordered that Defendant shall have a 30-day extension, or until June 19, 2017, to file her motion for summary judgment and cross-motion. All other deadlines are extended accordingly. (Valdez, E)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: plaintiff's opening brief now due by 4/19/2017; defendant's opposition brief due by 5/19/2017; and plaintiff's reply, if any, due by 6/5/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/13/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 4/12/2017 for plaintiff to file his opening brief, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/8/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulation and Order for extension of time to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/27/2017. (Plaintiff's Opening Brief Deadline: 3/8/2017) (Rosales, O)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/23/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Valdez Lopez
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ann Lucille Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?