Giha v. Lynch
Plaintiff: Caleb Fares Giha
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch
Case Number: 1:2016cv00893
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1252
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING 69 Motion to Proceed IFP ON APPEAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/24/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 42 Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/28/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING respondent's motion for leave to file a supplemental reply, document 59 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2018. (Rooney, M)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Directing additional discovery and Granting the Motion to Hold Pre-Trial Conference in Abeyance Pending Adjudication of Motion for Summary Judgment, document 54 . The parties are DIRECTED to conduct additional discovery limited to the followin g: a) Whether there is a disconnect between divorce proceedings in municipal courts in Peru and the RENIEC database; and b) Whether, relevant to the time period at issue in this case, the Civil Code of Peru, or any applicable law of Peru, mandates th at individuals register all divorce decrees with the municipality in which a marriage occurred in order to enter into a subsequent marriage or de facto union. Respondent has leave to file a supplemental brief regarding such discovery and the effect o n the issues no later than April 10, 2018. If Respondent files such a supplemental brief, Petitioner shall then have 21 days to file a supplemental responsive brief. The parties must file all provisions of law relied upon in addition to a certified t ranslation of such provision. All other dates not referenced in this order are VACATED. The Court will reset a pretrial conference after ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent still necessary. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/8/2018. (Rooney, M)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF No. 51). Respondent's reply is now due by January 11, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. (Thorp, J)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/30/2017. Good cause having been presented to the Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until December 21, 2017 to file and serve an opposition to the motion for summary judgment, (ECF No. 42 ), and Respondent shall have until December 28, 2017 to file a reply, if any. (Valdez, E)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Taking 34 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel under Advisement signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation to extend the following deadlines: Expert disclosure deadline: June 15, 2017; Rebuttal expert disclosure deadline: July 15, 2017; Expert witness discovery: August 13, 2017; with all other dates previously set by the Court to remain the same. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/31/2017: The non-expert discovery cutoff date in this case is extended to April 21, 2017. All other discovery dates previously set by the Court will remain the same. (Valdez, E)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER AMENDING the November 30, 2016 Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/10/2017. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Expert Disclosure Deadline: 6/1/20 17; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline: 6/30/2017. Expert Witness Discovery Deadline: 7/31/2017. Non-Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline: 8/30/2017; Response Deadline: Within 14 days of filing of the motion; Reply: Within 7 days of filing the respon se. Non-expert Discovery Motions: by 7/1/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadline: 9/29/2017; Response Deadline: 10/13/2017; Reply deadline: 10/27/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Bench Trial set for 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Valdez, E)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/16/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Show Cause re: Non Compliance with electronic filing requirements, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/7/2016. Show Cause Response due by 7/22/2016. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giha v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Fares Giha
Represented By: Mackenzie W. Mackins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?