Abrantes v. Fitness Evolution, LLC
Plaintiff: Jogert Abrantes
Defendant: Fitness Evolution, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00903
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/26/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Doc. 63) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2017. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/21/2017, is CONTINUED to 1/23/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Thorp, J)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint. Defendant, FITNESS 19 CA 228, LLC's (erroneously sued herein as Fitness 19 LLC) deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is hereby extended from October 26, 2017, to November 2, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/30/2017. (Timken, A)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 53 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/20/2017. Pursuant to the parties' (Doc. 53 ), and for good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, FITNESS 19 CA 228, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is extended from October 19, 2017, to October 26, 2017. (Valdez, E)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint, 52 . Defendant PLEASANTON FITNESS LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is extended from October 19, 2017, to October 26, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2017. (Timken, A)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Request to CONTINUE the Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/28/2017, is CONTINUED to 11/21/2017, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 11/14/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/20/2017. (Timken, A)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re 41 Defendants SocalEvolution LLC and Fitness Evolution Franchising LLC's Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/2017. Amended Complaint due by 10/5/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant, FITNESS 19 CA 228, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is extended from June 27, 2017, to July 18, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/23/2017. (Timken, A)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RECOGNIZING Operative Complaint and DIRECTING Clerk to Terminate Defendant M Group Fitness, LLC on the Docket for This Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Clerk to Terminate Defendants Fitness 19, Fitness 19 CA 228, LLC, Fitness Evolution Ashlan, Fitness Evolution Blackstone, Fitness Evolution Centerpoint, Fitness Evolution Encinitas, Fitness Evolution Figarden Loop, Fitness Evolution Herdon, Fitness Evolution, LLC, Christopher Johnson, Jeff Mayerson, Justin Bell and Sanjiv Chopra, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/31/17. Defendants Terminated Per Order. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrantes v. Fitness Evolution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jogert Abrantes
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitness Evolution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?