Mendoza v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Miriam Michelle Mendoza
Defendant: General Motors LLC, General Motors Corporation, Chevrolet Division of General Motors and Motors Liquidation Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00967
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Closing the Case 140 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2018: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AMENDED ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 11/16/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/2018. Petition for approval of minor's compromise due by 11/16/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 25, 2018. ECF Nos. 102, 103, 104 (Munoz, I)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER on Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Dismissal of GM Entities and Breach of Warranty Claims, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re Stipulation to Withdraw Plaintiff's "Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Additional Inspection of the Subject Vehicle" 91 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2018: The hearing presently scheduled for May 7, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. pertaining to plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider is vacated. (Hellings, J)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANT GM LLC'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF CHOICE OF LAW ISSUES AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF KENT JAYNE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 26, 2018. ECF Nos. 59, 66. (Munoz, I)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 58 Defendants' Motion for Additional Inspection of the Subject Vehicle, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/3/2018. (Hall, S)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE GENERAL MOTORS, LLC'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT RE GM LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF CHOICE OF LAW ISSUES RE PRODUCTS LIABILITY AND DAMAGES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 26, 2018. (Munoz, I)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 Stipulation re: Non-Dispositive and Pretrial Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/13/2018. (Hall, S)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Withdrawal of Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/2018. (Hall, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 48 Substitution of Attorney for defendant General Motors LLC, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/5/2017. (Hall, S)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 36 Defendant's Application for an Order Shortening Time for the Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order; ORDER SETTING Defendant's Motion 35 for Hearing on December 11, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2017. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to Respond to 36 the Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time No Later Than November 15, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/13/2017. (Hall, S)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting in Part 25 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/15/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 10/30/2017; Expert 1/19/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/26/2018; Hearing by 2/23/2018. (Hall, S)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE in Favor of Private Mediation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2017. Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2017 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER 18 as Modified by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2017. (Hall, S)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation to Amend the Deadline by Which the Parties May Seek a Pleading Amendment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2016. Pleading amendment deadline: 2/8/2017. (Hall, S)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2016. Consent/Decline Deadline 10/17/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/9/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 10/13/2016; Non-Expert 10/2/2017; Expert 12/8/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/22/2017; Hearing by 1/19/2018. Dispositive Motion Dea dlines: Filed by 2/2/2018; Hearing by 3/20/2018. Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Michelle Mendoza
Represented By: Richard Owen McConville, PHV
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Scarvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Ashley Richard Fickel
Represented By: Derek S. Whitefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevrolet Division of General Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motors Liquidation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?