Edwards v. Magallanes et al

Plaintiff: Steven R. Edwards
Defendant: Magallanes, M. Grajeda, Moon, McGrew, Khin Aye and Bowechop
Case Number: 1:2016cv00975
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment and Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment in Favor of Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice, for failure to provide the appropriate Rand Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Reconsideration and Amendment to September 7, 2018 Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Following in Camara Review of Documentation Submitted in Response to the Court's July 27, 2018, Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/07/2018. (Flores, E)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 , 25 Motions to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2018. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Magallanes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magallanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Grajeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khin Aye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowechop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?