The Estate of Jason Alderman et al v. City of Bakersfield et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Jason Alderman, Judy Edens, A. K. and S. A.
Defendant: City of Bakersfield, Bakersfield Police Department, Chad Garrett and Rick Wimbish
Case Number: 1:2016cv00994
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re DISMISSAL and CLOSING the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Petition for Minor's Compromise 88 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/20/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER 86 to Further Extend Deadline to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/4/2018. Dispositional documents due by 1/24/2019. (Hall, S)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2018. Good cause appearing and the parties having so stipulated, it is hereby ordered that the deadline to dismiss this action is extended by sixty (60) days, up to and including December 10, 2018. (Thorp, J)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATIONS 49 , 53 and 71 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/6/2018. (Thorp, J)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE MONELL CLAIMS 41 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/2018. (Thorp, J)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER 31 to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/8/2017. Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts: 12/5/2017. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 2/9/2018. (Hall, S)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ****Please disregard...Docketed in the wrong case****ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE AND EXPERT WITNESS RELATED DISCOVERY, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/24/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem 17 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/16. (Hellings, J)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/11/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/13/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 10/31/2016; Non-Expert 10/17/2017; Expert 12/11/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/27/2017; Hearing by 1/25/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/5/2018; Hear ing by 3/16/2018. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Jason Alderman et al v. City of Bakersfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Jason Alderman
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Edens
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. A.
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bakersfield
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakersfield Police Department
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Garrett
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wimbish
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?