Winn v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: Jay Winn
Defendant: County of Kern, Lisa Green, Scott Tunnicliffe and Charles Brown
Case Number: 1:2016cv01021
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 7/28/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings, including the trial date, are VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 to Continue Trial and Pretrial Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2018. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 4/30/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 6/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER 23 to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/28/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 1/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING 21 the Stipulation of the Parties and Continuing the Settlement Conference to January 4, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 1/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation to Take the Deposition of Brian Bergmark Beyond the Discovery Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2017. (Hall, S)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/2017. (Hall, S)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/13/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 11/4/2016; Non-Expert 7/24/2017; Expert 9/5/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set f or 7/24/2017 at 08:15 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/19/2017; Hearing by 10/17/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/3/2017; Hearing by 12/5/2017. Settlement Conference set for 9/11/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winn v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Winn
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Tunnicliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?