York v. CDCR Medical
Plaintiff: Dorothy York
Defendant: CDCR Medical
Case Number: 1:2016cv01034
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Defendants' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Judgment Should Not be Entered in Favor of Defendants for Failure to Respond to Dispositive Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2017. Show Cause Response due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 16 DISCOVERY ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. CDCR Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?