Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Eric Brian Thomas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01044
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/13/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order to extend time for Oral Argument, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/15/2017. (Oral Argument currently set for 10/5/2017 has been CONTINUED to 10/30/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
May 25, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/25/2017. Based on the above stipulation and good cause appearing therein, the Court grants Defendant an extension of time to file her opposition to Plaintiff's opening brief. Defendant's opposition brief shall be filed no later than May 31, 2017. Plaintiff may file his reply brief no later than June 15, 2017. No further extensions of Defendants deadline will be granted. (Valdez, E)
May 19, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order for extension of time for Defendant to file response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/19/2017. ( Response due by 5/26/2017) (Rosales, O)
April 24, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 5/19/2017 for receipt of defendant's opposition brief, with plaintiff's reply brief due by 6/5/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/24/2017. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Brian Thomas
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Roya Massoumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?