Jacobsen v. Curran et al

Plaintiff: Michael Neil Jacobsen
Defendant: Curran, Booking Officers, Booking Medical Staff and Medical Nurse
Case Number: 1:2016cv01050
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court Dismiss the Case for Plaintiff's Failures to Prosecute and to Comply with Court Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/14/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendant's 90 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/12/2018. (21-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order to Produce Transcripts 86 , 87 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/19/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 62 Motion to Postpone all Proceedings; ORDER Granting Defendant's 77 Motion to Vacate or Continue Dispositive Motions Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/06/2018. (Flores, E)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/09/2018. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendant Curran's 38 Motion for Summary Judgement; Deny Defendant Gonzalez's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/06/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/23/2018. (Flores, E)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying, without Prejudice, Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/03/2018. (Flores, E)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 67 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/31/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Modifying Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims 68 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/29/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims 43 ; ORDER Deeming First Amended Complaint 11 Amended to Substitute Timothy Ganiron as Defendant in Place of Does 1 and 5; Minerva Mangulabnan as Defendant in Place of Doe 6; Genevieve Garcia as Defendant in Place of Doe 7; and Dr. Burnett as Defendant in Place of Does 9 and 11 11 ; CLERK to Amend Docket to Reflect Substitutions, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/2018: The matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, including the initiation of service of process on the newly named defendants. (Hellings, J)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Open a New Case; ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Lodged First Amended Complaint and Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 53 , 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 47 ; ORDER GRANTING IN PART Motion for Extension of Time and Request for Copies 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2018: 45-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign a District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Non-Cognizable Claims be DISMISSED re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/2017. < I>This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. The new case number is 1:16-cv-01050-AWI-MJS (PC). Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 32 33 Request for Copies ; Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copies of ECF No. 26 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/06/2017. (Flores, E)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause 15 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Re-Send Plaintiff ECF No. 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/31/17. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/28/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 7 Motion for Addendum signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/31/2016. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobsen v. Curran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Neil Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booking Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booking Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?