Judith Howard v. City of Porterville et al
Plaintiff: Judith Howard
Defendant: City of Porterville and Porterville Unified School District
Case Number: 1:2016cv01071
Filed: July 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to Extend Date for Filing Dismissal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/12/2017. (Kusamura, W)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within five days of the date of service of this order; and Defendants Amended Answer will be due within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judith Howard v. City of Porterville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Howard
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Porterville
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Chin
Represented By: Christina Marie Forst
Represented By: Mark Foster Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porterville Unified School District
Represented By: Michelle E Sassano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?