Owens v. FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Owens
Defendant: FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Irwin Hoffman and Terry Poders Hoffman
Case Number: 1:2016cv01141
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Findings and Recommendations regarding Dismissal of Action re 1 Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/2017. Matter referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 10/16/2017. (Rosales, O)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Supplement the Statement of Plaintiff's Death Upon the Record with Evidence of Proper Service. Seven-Day Deadline. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/10/2017. (Herman, H)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION to Stay Action Due to Death of Plaintif; ORDER: (1.) This action is stayed. (2.) Plaintiffs representative shall either file a Motion for Substitution of Parties in this action on or before January 17, 2017, or the parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal of the action on or before January 24, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/4/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Owens
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Leigh Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Poders Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?