Acosta v. Fast N Esy II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Defendant: Fast N Esy II, Inc., Vinay Vohra and Vikram Vohra
Case Number: 1:2016cv01150
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO CONTINUE Scheduling Conference from 3/21/2017 to 4/25/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Denying Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/09/2017. (Flores, E)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference to 1/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report no later then seven days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2016. (Hernandez, M)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 10, 2016.(Doc. 8) (Munoz, I)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re STIPULATION for Continuance of Mandatory Scheduling Conference: Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for October 31, 2016, is continued to December 14, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 9. The parties are to file their Joint Scheduling Report no later than seven days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/2016. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Fast N Esy II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast N Esy II, Inc.
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinay Vohra
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikram Vohra
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?