Pulido v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Hector Pulido
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01155
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Petitioners motion for attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act is GRANTED; Petitioner is awarded fees and costs in the amount of $5,046.48 under 24 U.S.C. § 2412(d); and Defendant shall determine whether Plaintiffs EAJA attorney fees are subject to any offset permitted under the United States Department of the Treasurys Offset Program and, if the fees are not subj ect to an offset, shall cause payment of fees to be made directly to Plaintiff's counsel, Kelsey Mackenzie Brown, 1003 Whitman Street, Tacoma, WA 98406 pursuant to the assignment executed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants opposition to the motion for attorney fees shall be filed on or before December 4, 2017; and Any reply by Plaintiff shall be filed on or before December 11, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal and REMANDING for Further Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before July 12, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before July 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The order to show cause filed May 24, 2017 is DISCHARGED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before June 30, 2017. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed on or before July 17, 2017.(Thorp, J)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SCHEDULING ORDER. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a written response to this order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute within seven (7) days of the date of service of this order. Failure to comply with this order to show cause shall result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before May 19, 2017, and all other dates in the scheduling order are extended accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulido v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Pulido
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?