Hof v. Kernan et al

Plaintiff: Shain C. Hof
Defendant: Scott Kernan, Aaronjit Kaleka, M.D. and E. Conanan, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01169
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Court Grant Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/16/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 Days. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Complete Discovery 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:16-cv-1764 EFB) to Fresno (1:16-cv-1169 MJS) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/8/16. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hof v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shain C. Hof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaronjit Kaleka, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Conanan, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?