Powell v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: April Powell
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group and Fresno Pacific University
Case Number: 1:2016cv01197
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/15/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL. Pursuant to Rule 141 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court, Eastern District of California, and for the reasons discussed at the Scheduling Conference held on January 12, 2017, the Administrative Record shall be filed UNDER SEAL, and only case participants are to have access to that document. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/7/2017. (Thorp, J)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/13/2016, is CONTINUED to 1/12/2017, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 1/5/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/4/2016. (Timken, A)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNUM'S MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2016. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Powell
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Peter J. Felsenfeld
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Peter J. Felsenfeld
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Pacific University
Represented By: Michael S. Helsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?