Gomez v. City of Farmersville, et al.

Plaintiff: Bernardina Gomez
Defendant: City of Farmersville and Farmersville Police Department
Case Number: 1:2016cv01252
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/18/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 21, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY MATTER PENDING SETTLEMENT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 7, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to March 21, 2018. Rebuttal expert witness disclosure is extended to April 4, 2018. Expert witness discovery is extended to April 18, 2018. These modifications do not change any other existing scheduling deadlines, including motion deadlines, the pretrial conference, and the trial date. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/7/2018. (Timken, A)
November 21, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/2017. (Timken, A)
October 30, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Stipulated Protective Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/30/2017. (Timken, A)
October 17, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/17/2017. (Timken, A)
October 2, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: 2/1/2018. Expert Disclosures: 2/8/2018. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 2/22/2018. Expert Discovery Deadline: 3/9/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Fil ing Deadline: 3/23/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: 4/25/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 4/27/2018. Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: 6/11/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 10/9/2018, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/29/2017. (Timken, A)
December 21, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: January 3, 2017; Non Expert Discovery: October 10, 2017; Expert Disclosures: October 16, 2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: November 6, 2017; Expert Discovery: December 22, 2017. Mid-Di scovery Status Conference is set for August 15, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Mid-Discovery Status Report shall be filed no later than August 8, 2017. Non-Dispositive Motions shall be filed by January 3, 2018. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by February 5, 2018. Settlement Conference is set for December 5, 2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Pretrial Conference set for May 16, 2018, a t 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial (7-10 days) set for July 10, 2018, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/21/2016. (Thorp, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. City of Farmersville, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardina Gomez
Represented By: Andrew Butler Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Farmersville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmersville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?