Holland v. Schuyler et al

Plaintiff: Everett Holland
Defendant: C Schuyler, T Haak, R Esmond, Hunley and Maciejewski
Case Number: 1:2016cv01271
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this case be dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with a court order 27 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/9/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Case be Dismissed, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim re 20 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/19. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER Referring Action to Magistrate Judge for Further Screening signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/7/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this case be Dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under 1983 and the Clerk be ordered to Close this case re 20 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Everett Holland ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/11/18. Objections to F&R due by 3/1/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 10 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/28/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Request for Screening Order and granting Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/24/2017. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Schuyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Schuyler
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Haak
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Esmond
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunley
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maciejewski
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?