Guerrero v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luis Guerrero
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01300
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CLOSING THE ACTION re 50 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/16/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AFTER 48 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2019. Stipulated dismissal due by 11/8/2019. (Hall, S)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Motion to Compel Arbitration 29 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/26/2018: The motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. In light of the foregoing analysis granting Defendant's motion to compel arbitration of Plaintiff's individual claims, the Court STAYS this action pursuant to the FAA, 9 U.S.C. § 3, pending completion of the arbitration. (Hellings, J)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 38 Motion to Stay and Holding in Abeyance Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN AS UNTIMELY signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 31, 2017. (ECF NO. 30) (Munoz, I)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation to Continue the Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/13/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 4/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 2, 2016. (ECF No. 4) (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Guerrero
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Serb
Represented By: William Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?