Soest v. Mojave Air and Space Port, et al.
Plaintiff: Ernest Dean Soest
Defendant: Mojave Air and Space Port, East Kern Airport District, Stuart Witt and Kevin Wojtkiewicz
Case Number: 1:2016cv01334
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CLOSING CASE re 23 Stipulation signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/26/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING 11 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/10/2017. Joint status report due by 8/18/2017. (Hall, S)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to the PARTIES to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/24/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 6 STAY, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/20/2016. CASE STAYED. All pending dates, hearings and conferences are VACATED. Joint status report due by 5/19/2017. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soest v. Mojave Air and Space Port, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Dean Soest
Represented By: Olaf A. Landsgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojave Air and Space Port
Represented By: Michael J. Terhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Kern Airport District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Witt
Represented By: Michael J. Terhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wojtkiewicz
Represented By: Michael J. Terhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?