Martin v. Desha
Plaintiff: Lanell Martin
Defendant: D. Desha
Case Number: 1:2016cv01353
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 22 Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice and without Leave to Amend for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/15/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 6/2/2017.(Flores, E)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Findings and Recommendations and Closing Case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/13/2017. (Flores, E)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Non-Cognizable Claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/11/2017. (Flores, E)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting 12 Findings and Recommendations and Denying 8 Motion for Remand, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/8/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Proceed on Cognizable First Amendment Retaliation Claim Against Defendant Desha and to Dismiss All Other Claims re 13 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny 8 Motion for Remand signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/07/2016. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/27/2016.(Flores, E)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's 2 Request for screening order and extension of time to file responsive pleading signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/1/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Desha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanell Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Desha
Represented By: Sean W. Lodholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?