Lane v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen Lane
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01386
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees, document 23 , as follows: 1) Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and expenses under the EAJA is GRANTED; 2) Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of $6,4 46.08; 3) The Commissioner is respectfully directed to determine whether Plaintiff's EAJA attorney's fees are subject to any offset permitted under the United States Department of the Treasury's Offset Program and, if the fees are not subject to an offset, shall cause payment of fees to be made directly to Plaintiff unless the Government decides to accept the assignment of fees; and 4) The Commissioner is directed to mail the payment to Plaintiff's counsel. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/17/2018. (Rooney, M)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/21/2016. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lane
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?