Spalliero v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nick Angelo Spalliero
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01387
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint;this Court denies plaintiff's appeal from the administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security; Judgment In Favor of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security and Against Plaintiff Nick Angelo Spalliero, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/13/18.CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 24) for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief NUNC PRO TUNC. Plaintiff will not be prejudiced by the brief one-day delay, and all other briefing deadlines shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/16/2017. (Herman, H)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/17: Response EXTENDED to August 14, 2017. (Hellings, J)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/17. Responses due by 8/7/2017. (Marrujo, C)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment: that Defendant shall have a 30-day extension, or until July 24, 2017, in which to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2017. (Herman, H)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief: that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including May 24, 2017, in which to file Plaintiffs Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/12/2017. (Herman, H)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/22/16. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spalliero v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Angelo Spalliero
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Roya Massoumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?