Bridgeman v. Hashemi
Plaintiff: Michael Dayne Bridgeman
Defendant: Nastran Hashemi
Case Number: 1:2016cv01399
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/12/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Adopting 8 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and to Direct Plaintiff to Pay $400 Filing Fee, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/17. Filing Fee Due Within Fourteen-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/31/2016 vacating 7 Order; and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and direct Plaintiff to pay $400.00 filing fee. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; 14-Day Deadline for Objections to F&R's. (Lundstrom, T)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and directing Plaintiff to pay filing fee of $400.00 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/24/2016. (Filing Fee Deadline: 11/10/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgeman v. Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dayne Bridgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nastran Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?