Michael A. Washington v. Hernandez et al

Plaintiff: Michael A. Washington
Defendant: R. Hernandez, M. Stane, R. Stinson, M. Chambers, P. Chanelo and J. Denney
Case Number: 1:2016cv01439
Filed: September 27, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Stipulated Dismissal of Action 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/2018: This action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and close this case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
July 17, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Settlement, Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 2, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion to appear for the settlement conference by video or telephone signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/2/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
June 19, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Michael A. Washingon, CDCR #V-39680 on July 16, 2018 at 8:30 AM, at CSP-Corcoran, before Magistrate Judge Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/18/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 12, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference on July 16, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/11/2018. Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
June 5, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING Statement of Joint Meet and Confer Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 11, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of the Discovery Deadline Without Prejudice 31 ; ORDER DIRECTING the Parties to Meet and Confer, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/11/2018: 30-Day Deadline for Joint Statement. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel 28 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/23/2018. (Hellings, J)
January 11, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/11/2018. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Settlement Negotiations, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
December 18, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Chanelo be dismissed from this action for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim against him for which relief may be granted re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Michael A. Washington ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2017. Objections to F&R due by 1/4/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
December 14, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion Requesting to Conduct Settlement Negotiations, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/17. ( Responses due 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael A. Washington v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Chanelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?