Nommensen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Nommensen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01442
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 1 Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulation to extend time to file opening brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/21/2017. (Opening Brief Deadline: 9/21/2017) (Rosales, O)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Extension of Time for USM Forms on or Before January 9, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nommensen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Nommensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?