Lopez v. Paramo
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Petitioner: Jose M Lopez
Case Number: 1:2016cv01489
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Adopting 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to DENY Petitioner's 25 Motion for a Certificate of Appealability signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Court DENY Petitioner's Motion for a Certificate of Appealability re 25 ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/24/2018. Objections to F&R due by 10/29/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 18 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Denial of Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/31/17. Traverse Deadline: 05/15/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/30/17. (Hellings, J)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to amend caption signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/6/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Represented By: Darren Kyle Indermill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?