Stoltzner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andy D. Stoltzner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01490
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AFFIRMING Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation for an extension of ten days for defendant to respond to plaintiff's opening brief, with the scheduling order modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/4/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request as follows: Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including August 31, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief; Defendant may have an extension of time to October 2, 2017, to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by Plaintiff will be due October 17, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/4/2017. It is hereby ordered that plaintiff may have an extension of time for Plaintiff to provide Defendant with Plaintiff's Settlement Letter Brief to and including May 2, 2017; Defendant may have an extension of time to June 6, 2017 to file her response. All other deadlines in the scheduling order are modified accordingly. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoltzner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy D. Stoltzner
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?