Warrior v. Santiago et al

Plaintiff: Marvellous Afrikan Warrior
Defendant: Jessica Santiago, Sodhi and Myron
Case Number: 1:2016cv01504
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case be DISMISSED, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted Under Section 1983 and the Clerk be Directed to Close the Case re 10 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/11/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/11/17. (Marrujo, C)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Application Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , 4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/20/2016. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warrior v. Santiago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvellous Afrikan Warrior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sodhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?