Saint Agnes Medical Center v. HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Saint Agnes Medical Center
Defendant: HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01535
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Deadline to Conduct Previously Scheduled Depositions: the non-expert discovery cut off, as it pertains only to each parties' respective deposition notice previously served, shall be extended from October 9, 2017 to October 20, 2017. Further, it is agreed that no party shall object to the timeliness of the above referenced depositions as long as said depositions are completed in accordance with the new date set forth herein. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/26/2017. (Herman, H)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Deadlines to Conduct Previously Scheduled Depositions (Doc. 13): Expert Disclosure was September 22, 2017, now October 27, 2017. Supplemental Expert Disclosure was October 6, 2017, now November 10, 2017. Expert Discovery Cutoff was October 31, 2017, now December 1, 2017. The Pretrial Motion filing deadline, Pretrial Conference, and Bench Trial dates will remain as set in the January 13, 2017 Scheduling Order. (Doc. 9). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2017. (Herman, H)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO CONDUCT PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED DEPOSITIONS, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/5/217. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Agnes Medical Center v. HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Agnes Medical Center
Represented By: Jennifer Jiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Jared W. Matheson
Represented By: Travis R. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?