Murrieta v. Corrections Corporation of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Murrieta
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America, Inc., A. Hansen and Hightower
Case Number: 1:2016cv01552
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE 33 & 34 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/25/2017. (Timken, A)
August 30, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/30/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 29, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to ADVANCE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE and to APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE HEARING. The stipulated request to advance the Pretrial Conference and to appear by telephone at the hearing (Doc. 22) is GRANTED. The Pretrial Conferenc e is advanced to September 25, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Oberto in Courtroom 7. By no later than September 18, 2017, the parties shall file and email to skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov in MS Word format their joint pretrial sta tement. The parties shall also attend a settlement conference on September 12, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10 before the Honorable Erica P. Grosjean. The parties shall submit their confidential settlement statements to EPGorders@caed.uscourts.gov by no later than September 5, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/29/2017. (Timken, A)
August 2, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Counsel to Meet and Confer to Determine Whether the Parties Will Consent to the Jurisdiction of a Different Magistrate Judge or to Continue the Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2017. (Hall, S)
December 27, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS Against CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., Only, With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2016. (Hall, S)
December 23, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/22/2016. The new case number is 1:16-cv-01552-JLT.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murrieta v. Corrections Corporation of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Murrieta
Represented By: Greg Wegner Garrotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?