Johana Martinez v. Enderton et al

Plaintiff: Johana Martinez
Defendant: Elizabeth L. Enderton, Family Healthcare Network, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Kaweah Delta Health Care District
Case Number: 1:2016cv01556
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/22/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 18, 2019. (ECF No. 54) (Munoz, I)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 15, 2019. (Munoz, I)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/8/2018. (Kusamura, W)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadlines; Pretrial Conference currently set for 1/30/2019 is moved to 2/6/2019 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/31/2018. (Kusamura, W)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/14/2018. (Kusamura, W)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Terminate Defendant Kaweah Delta Health Care District signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/24/2018. (Flores, E)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Stipulation and protective order regarding confidential information and documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/16/2018. (Rosales, O)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/11/2017, is CONTINUED to 7/27/2017, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/5/2017. (Timken, A)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM Decision and ORDER Granting Defendant United States' 18 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/8/17. Twenty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johana Martinez v. Enderton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johana Martinez
Represented By: Stephen James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth L. Enderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Healthcare Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaweah Delta Health Care District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?