Wahl v. Sutton
Plaintiff: Peter Gerard Wahl
Defendant: Sutton
Case Number: 1:2016cv01576
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Record on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal; ORDER DENYING 55 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/02/2019. (Flores, E)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's 41 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/04/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/23/2019.(Flores, E)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING 48 Motion to Stay of Proceedings as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/19. (Marrujo, C)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Re-Serve Motion to Dismiss on Plaintiff at Correct Address of Record signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/27/2018. (Flores, E)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying 39 Request for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/2/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 32 Motion for Documents to Comprise the Excerpts of Record on Appeal; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Mail Copies of Excerpts of Record on Appeal to Plaintiff by June 5, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/4/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to randomly Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Claim re 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/29/18. This case is assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The New Case No. is: 1:16-cv-01576-LJO-BAM. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within 14-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Service and Issuance of Summons signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's Supplemental Pleading 8 ; ORDER DENYING 9 Motion to Supplement ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2017. (30-Day Deadline for First Amended Complaint) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/11/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahl v. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gerard Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?