Kelly v. Madden
Petitioner: John Michael Kelly
Respondent: Raymond Madden
Case Number: 1:2016cv01577
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/22/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within 21 Days. (Gonzalez, R)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER WITHDRAWING 20 Findings and Recommendation of March 20, 2017; ORDER GRANTING Respondent's 25 Motion to Withdraw 14 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DEEMING Petitioner's 17 Motion to Stay as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/8/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding 22 Petitioner's Motion to Proceed signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/9/2017. Respondent is directed to file either a supplement to his motion to dismiss, or a motion to withdraw his motion to dismiss within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 14 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Petitioner's Motion for Stay of Proceedings 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?