Larkin v. Shiver et al.
Plaintiff: Shondel Larkin
Defendant: Sheba Shiver, Robert Fischer, Clarence Cryer, Jr. and J. Lewis
Case Number: 1:2016cv01590
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Comply with a Court Order and Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/5/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order and Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/10/2017. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Submit Exhibits, and DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Motion to Stay the Proceedings 9 , 10 , 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/16: Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Motion to Stay are DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:16-cv-2378 CKD PC) to Fresno (1:16-cv-1590 SAB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/2016. This court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin v. Shiver et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shondel Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheba Shiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Cryer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?