Mendoza v. Golden Valley Health Centers et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Mendoza
Defendant: Golden Valley Health Centers, Tony Weber, Michael Buda, Arden L. Bennett and Denise Ybarra Perez
Case Number: 1:2016cv01611
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to Prosecute signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/27/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DECLINING to Adopt 7 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days in Which to File an Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This Action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim re 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/30/2017. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file his first amended complaint is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall file his first amended complaint on or before July 5, 2017.(Hernandez, M)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING 3 Request for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2017. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING 1 Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; Amended Complaint Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Golden Valley Health Centers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Valley Health Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Buda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arden L. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Ybarra Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?