Vahora v. Valley Diagnostics Laboratory Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gulamnabi Vahora
Defendant: Valley Diagnostics Laboratory Inc., Naeem Mujtaba Qarni, Najam Ul Mujtaba Qarni and Sheikh M. Masood
Case Number: 1:2016cv01624
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER approving Amended Proposed Supersedeas Bond re 182 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYINGWITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT VALLEY DIAGNOSTICS LABORATORY, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO ENFORCE THE JUDGMENT AND APPROVE BOND, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/13/2019. (Kusamura, W)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/2/2019. (Kusamura, W)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER BY GRANTING THE PARTIES LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED FINAL EXHIBIT LISTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/10/2019. (Kusamura, W)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED ADDITIONS TO THE JOINT VERDICT FORM, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/29/2019. (Kusamura, W)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE PRETRIAL ORDER AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME; Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/21/2019. (Kusamura, W)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE on 2/8/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/6/2019. (Kusamura, W)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order on parties' 71 77 Motions in Limine, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/20/2018. (Rosales, Otilia)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order GRANTING 72 73 Motions to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/7/2018. Jury Trial currently set for 10/2/2018 has been CONTINUED to 1/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The hearing on the motions in limine, currently set for September 11, 2018, is VACATED. (Rosales, O)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order regarding settlement conference procedures, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/424/2018. Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. At least five (5) court days prior to the settlement conference, each party shall submit a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement in Word format directly to Judge Grosjeans Chambers at epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Rosales, O)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/4/2018. (Timken, A)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, 44 & 46 . The Court: 1) DENIES the motion to dismiss the second cause of action against Defendants Qarni and VDL; 2) DENIES the mo tion to dismiss the third cause of action against Defendant Qarni; 3) GRANTS the motion to dismiss Plaintiff's fourth cause of action against Defendant VDL; and 4) DENIES the motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint for noncompliance with Rule 8(a). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/23/2017. (Timken, A)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 35 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the proposed amended complaint attached to the Motion to Amend (See Doc. 35, Ex. 3), as the "Second Amended Complaint" by no later than 8/2/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/25/2017. (Timken, A)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, 26 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/14/2017. (Timken, A)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/9/17. New Case Number: 1:16-cv-01624 SKO. (Marrujo, C)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S 8 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/3/2017. (Amended Complaint due by 4/24/2017).(Lundstrom, T) (Main Document 24 replaced on 4/3/2017) (Munoz, I).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss. The Court hereby CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to May 23, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report by no later than May 16, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/21/2017. (Timken, A)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER re Response of Najam Ul Mujtaba Qarni. The deadline for Defendant Najam Ul Mujtaba Qarni to file a responsive pleading shall be within the time prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/16/2017. (Thorp, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vahora v. Valley Diagnostics Laboratory Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulamnabi Vahora
Represented By: Monique Debrikka Jewett-Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Diagnostics Laboratory Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naeem Mujtaba Qarni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najam Ul Mujtaba Qarni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheikh M. Masood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?