Anderson v. County of Madera et al
Plaintiff: David Anderson
Defendant: County of Madera, Madera County District Attorney's Office, David Linn, Michael Kietz, John Anderson, Nicolas Fogg and Robert Blehm
Case Number: 1:2016cv01629
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Case be DISMISSED With Prejudice for Failing to Comply With the Court's Orders Entered August 2 and October 16, 2017 re 7 Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/9/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE RECOMMENDED FOR DISMISSAL. By no later than November 6, 2017, Plaintiff shall file his proofs of service or a statement showing cause why the Court should not recommend to the presiding district court j udge that this action be dismissed. The Court further CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to file the proofs of service or statement by November 6, 2017, the Court will recommend to the presiding district court judge that this action be dismissed, in its entirety. In order to permit time for Plaintiff to comply with this Order, the scheduling conference currently set for October 31, 2017, is VACATED and RESET for December 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/16/2017. (Timken, A)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING Service of Defendants and Continuing Scheduling Conference 10 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to file proof of service of the amended complaint on Defendants by 9/19/2017. In order to permit time for Plaintiff to effectuate service, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/19/2017, is VACATED and RESET for 10/31/2017, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/2/2017. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. County of Madera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Madera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Blehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?