Kim et al v. U.S. Secretary of The Interior et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Kim, Grace Kim, Hannah Kim, Francis S. Lee and Vivian Lee
Defendant: U.S. National Park Services, Yosemite National Park and U.S. Secretary of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2016cv01656
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 1/9/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2019. (Kusamura, W)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/07/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/22/2017, is CONTINUED to 11/21/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report no later than 11/14/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/10/2017. (Timken, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss 19 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/15/17: 30-Day Deadline to Amend Complaint. (Hellings, J)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/13/2017, is CONTINUED to 8/22/2017, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 8/15/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/2017. (Timken, A)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Substitute the United States of America as Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/28/17. Yosemite National Park, U.S. National Park Services and U.S. Secretary of the Interior terminated.(Martin-Gill, S)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 15 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/23/2017, is CONTINUED to 4/25/2017, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report by no later than 4/18/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/10/2017. (Thorp, J)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appoint Grace Kim as Guardian Ad Litem for Hannah Kim. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/23/2016. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim et al v. U.S. Secretary of The Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. National Park Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yosemite National Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Secretary of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kim
Represented By: Kelly C. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Kim
Represented By: Kelly C. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Kim
Represented By: Kelly C. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis S. Lee
Represented By: Kelly C. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Lee
Represented By: Kelly C. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?