Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Patty Lynn Martin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01676
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/9/2018. (Hall, S)
March 13, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Remanding the Action Pursuant to Sentence Four; ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Patty Martin and Against Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/12/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 31, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/31/2017. Response to opening brief due by 8/31/2017. (Hall, S)
November 7, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER DIRECTING Service of the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2016. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Lynn Martin
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Roya Massoumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?