Ayala v. Frito Lay, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rebecca M. Ayala
Defendant: Frito Lay, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01705
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/8/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/7/2018. (1. Plaintiff's 28 motion for leave to file a third amended complaint is granted, and the third amended complaint (Doc. No. 28-2) is deemed filed and served as of the date of this order; and 2. Defendant shall file a response to the third amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the service of this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss ;ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Strike signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/29/2017. (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER Granting in Part 5 Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Pending 3 Motion to Dismiss and 4 Motion to Strike Certain Allegations of the Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/7/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala v. Frito Lay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca M. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito Lay, Inc.
Represented By: James Harrod Berry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?