Saechao v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sarn Sing Saechao
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01716
Filed: November 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING the Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/03/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order to Show Cause why the action should not be dismissed for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the courts order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/16/2017. Show Cause Response due by 11/2/2017. (Rosales, O)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff; ORDER Directing Clerk to Update Docket and Serve Pro Se Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2017. (Hall, S)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/9/2017. Opening brief due by 9/5/2017. (Hall, S)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order discharging the Order to Show Cause dated May 31, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2017. (Rosales, O)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER Directing Service of the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/16. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saechao v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarn Sing Saechao
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?