Paramount Petroleum Corporation v. Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Paramount Petroleum Corporation
Defendant: Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv01722
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Paramount Petroleum Corporation. (Osborne, Gary)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE THE CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
February 3, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Paramount Petroleum Corporation. (Osborne, Gary)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AFTER #7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 2/3/2017. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 10, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Paramount Petroleum Corporation. (Osborne, Gary)
December 6, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company served on 11/28/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. (Osborne, Gary)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gary W. Osborne* *Osborne & Nesbitt LLP* *501 West Broadway, Suite 1760* *San Diego, California 92101*. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 14, 2016 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Plaintiff Paramount Petroleum Corporation. (Osborne, Gary)
November 14, 2016 RECEIPT number 0972-6771312 for $400.00 for Paramount Petrolium Corporation. (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2016 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Gary Osborne re #1 Complaint: Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event NewCase Credit Card Payments. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 77-121c). If you wish to pay with cash, check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents willbe deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to theCM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
November 10, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company by Paramount Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osborne, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paramount Petroleum Corporation v. Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Gary Wayne Osborne
Represented By: Dominic Stephen Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?