Davis et al v. Clarksean
Plaintiff: Paul Davis and Robert E. Johnson Family Limited Partnership
Defendant: Thomas Clarksean
Case Number: 1:2016cv01724
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on Joint Stipulation to Dismiss the Matter with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/22/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Terminate Cross-Claim Defendant Errol Gene Shaw, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/8/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING 19 the Stipulation of Counsel re: the Filing of an Amended Answer and Cross-Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2017. (Hall, S)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING THE MATTER TO VDRP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2017. All dates are VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Stipulation to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/17/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 2/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Clarksean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Davis
Represented By: Brian Haig Krikorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Johnson Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brian Haig Krikorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Clarksean
Represented By: William L. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?