Baker v. Moreno, et al.
Plaintiff: Tommie Lee Baker, III
Defendant: Raymond A. Moreno, Choua Yang and Mark Evans
Case Number: 1:2016cv01758
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Case for Failure to Prosecute and Obey the Court's Orders signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/16/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/12/2018.(Flores, E)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the Action Should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order and for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/10/2018. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/11/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 28 Motion to Stay; Discovery and Scheduling Order is Modified to Vacate all current deadlines and stay discovery in this action other than that related to Plaintiff's exhaustion efforts, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/4/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/28/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs Motion for Injunctive Relief, filed November 3, 2015, be denied for lack of jurisdiction ; ORDER REQUESTING Assistance of Litigation Coordinator as to 23 MOTION for CDCR Staff to release Plaintiff's personal property ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2017. Objections to F&R due (21-Day Deadline) (Copy of this order and plaintiff's motion sent to Litigation Coordinator at RJD) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/11/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/13/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/3/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Moreno, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Lee Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choua Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?