United States of America v. Barela
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Tina Barela
Case Number: 1:2016cv01805
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF RELEASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/15/2018. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that TINA BARELA be released forthwith. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action in its entirety. (Thorp, J)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELEASING Respondent Tina Barela; REQUIRING her to Appear on November 27, 2017 to Answer for Civil Contempt Charges and to Produce Documents Responsive to the IRS Subpoena; and DISCHARGING Warrant of Arrest signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/2017. Hearing set for 11/27/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Finding Respondent in Civil Contempt of Orders Filed March 24, 2017 and September 5, 2017 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/23/2017. (Flores, E)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CIVIL CONTEMPT. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/5/217. (Kusamura, W)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and Order RE: IRS Summons Enforcement signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/6/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 Days. (Sant Agata, S)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/2/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tina Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?