Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Justin Cody Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01861
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Calaveras
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/21/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Plaintiff's Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file his motion for summary judgment on or before October 20, 2017. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order for this case, (Doc. 3), are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/17/2017. (Timken, A)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/REMAND. Plaintiff shall file his Motion for Summary Judgment/Remand on or before August 22, 2017. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/29/2017. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Cody Wilson
Represented By: Langley Ellen Kreuze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?